Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, to operate not more than 200 electronic machines if the entity operated fewer than 200 electronic machines on February 28, 2008.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page