Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Judiciary to collect, maintain, and provide certain access to certain information on eviction actions; requiring the Maryland Judiciary to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the eviction data by August 31, 2022, and each year thereafter; establishing that a substantial loss of income due to a declared catastrophic health emergency is an affirmative defense to certain eviction actions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0910
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {892718/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {933629/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (44-86)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {183326/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638776/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {373124/1 (Senator Hettleman) Withdrawn
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Rejected (30-16)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {892718/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Floor Amendment {933629/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (44-86) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Floor Amendment {183326/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (51-83) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {638776/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Floor Amendment {373124/1 (Senator Hettleman) Withdrawn 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Rejected (30-16) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   8-1001 through 8-1004, 8-901 )
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page