Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Low-Income Communities
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities to develop certain policies and recommendations to place certain priorities in certain years for directing certain spending on clean energy and energy efficiency programs, projects, or investments to benefit certain low-income communities; providing for the application of certain priorities to certain programs, projects, and investments; requiring the Commission to consult with the Department of the Environment and certain other agencies; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Low-Income Communities
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page