Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration suspend the driving privileges of a person for delinquent unpaid traffic fines; requiring the District Court or a circuit court to refer delinquent unpaid traffic fines to the Central Collection Unit in the Department of Budget and Management for collection; making certain conforming changes governing the contents of a traffic citation; requiring the District Court or a circuit court to provide certain notice of referral of a delinquent unpaid fine; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page