Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to make certain disclosures to a pharmacy services administrative organization at the time of entering into a contract and within a certain number of working days before a contract change; prohibiting a contract form or an amendment to a contract form between a pharmacy benefits manager and a pharmacy services administrative organization from becoming effective except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page