Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Personal Property Tax – Businesses Affected by COVID–19 Restrictions – Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to reimburse businesses affected in a certain manner by certain COVID-19 restrictions that file a business personal property tax return during the period from January 1, 2021, to April 15, 2021, for the full amount of business personal property tax paid by the businesses in calendar year 2020; requiring the Department to reimburse eligible businesses exclusively out of certain State funds and in the order in which the businesses filed personal property tax returns; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Business Personal Property Tax – Businesses Affected by COVID–19 Restrictions – Reimbursement
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page