Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Gene Synthesis Providers and Manufacturers of Gene Synthesis Equipment – Certification
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, by January 1, 2023, to develop gene sequence and customer screening guidelines for gene synthesis providers and manufacturers of gene synthesis equipment that include certain requirements; requiring the Department to develop a process to certify that gene synthesis providers and manufacturers of gene synthesis equipment are in compliance with the guidelines; requiring, on or after January 1, 2024, the Department to certify certain gene synthesis providers and equipment manufacturers; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health – Gene Synthesis Providers and Manufacturers of Gene Synthesis Equipment – Certification
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   17-801 through 17-806 )
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 10:51 AM
Click to return on the top page