Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Belcastro, R. Jones, Kaiser, Kerr, Patterson, Pippy, Proctor, Ruth, Thiam, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain public agencies from using seclusion as a behavioral health intervention for a student; prohibiting a public agency from using physical restraint and a nonpublic school from using physical restraint or seclusion as a behavioral health intervention for a student, except under certain circumstances; requiring the State Department of Education to develop an accountability system to measure compliance with regulations adopted on the use of physical restraint and seclusion; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {343821/1 Adopted 34AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543227/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Text - Chapter - Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Age
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page