Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Belcastro
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing obsolete and redundant language in, clarifying language in, and reorganizing certain provisions of law governing the State Board of Physicians and the regulation of physicians, physician assistants, and allied health professionals; authorizing the Board to regulate the allied health committees; and repealing the requirement that the Board provide a certain data sheet.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0972
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-404.2,   12-102,   1-302,   1-306,   14-101,   14-102,   14-205,   14-206,   14-206.1,   14-207,   14-301,   14-302,   14-303, 14-304, 14-305, 14-306,   14-307,   14-308,   14-308.1,   14-309,   14-311,   14-312,   14-313,   14-313.1,   14-314,   14-315,   14-316,   14-317,   14-318 through 14-320,   14-322,   14-3A-01,   14-401.1,   14-401.2, 14-402,   14-404,   14-405,   14-406,   14-409,   14-411,   14-411.1,   14-413,   14-413 through 14-415,   14-416,   14-417, 14-502,   14-503,   14-504,   14-505,   14-506,   14-507,   14-508,   14-509,   14-510, 14-511, 14-513, 14-514, 14-515, 14-516, 14-517, 14-518, 14-521, 14-524, 14-525, 14-527, 14-528, 14-5A-01,   14-5A-02 through 14-5A-04,   14-5A-05,   14-5A-06,   14-5A-09,   14-5A-10,   14-5A-11,   14-5A-13,   14-5A-14,   14-5A-16,   14-5A-17,   14-5A-17.1,   14-5A-18.1,   14-5A-19,   14-5B-02 through 14-5B-04,   14-5B-05,   14-5B-07,   14-5B-09,   14-5B-10,   14-5B-11,   14-5B-12,   14-5B-12.1,   14-5B-13,   14-5B-14,   14-5B-14.1,   14-5B-15.1,   14-5B-16,   14-5C-01,   14-5C-02 through 14-5C-04,   14-5C-05,   14-5C-06,   14-5C-08,   14-5C-09,   14-5C-10,   14-5C-11,   14-5C-12,   14-5C-14,   14-5C-14.1,   14-5C-16,   14-5C-17,   14-5C-18.1,   14-5C-19,   14-5D-02,   14-5D-03,   14-5D-05,   14-5D-07,   14-5D-08,   14-5D-09,   14-5D-10,   14-5D-12,   14-5D-12.1,   14-5D-13,   14-5D-14,   14-5D-15,   14-5D-16,   14-5D-16.1,   14-5E-01,   14-5E-02 through 14-5E-04,   14-5E-06,   14-5E-08,   14-5E-09,   14-5E-10,   14-5E-11,   14-5E-13,   14-5E-14,   14-5E-15,   14-5E-16,   14-5E-17,   14-5E-18.1,   14-5E-19,   14-5F-04,   14-5F-05,   14-5F-07,   14-5F-11,   14-5F-12,   14-5F-13,   14-5F-15,   14-5F-15.1,   14-5F-16,   14-5F-17,   14-5F-18,   14-5F-21,   14-5F-23,   14-5F-24,   14-5G-02 through 14-5G-04,   14-5G-09,   14-5G-10,   14-5G-11,   14-5G-13,   14-5G-14,   14-5G-15,   14-5G-16,   14-5G-17,   14-5G-18,   14-5G-19,   14-5G-21,   14-5G-22,   14-5H-01, 14-5H-02, 14-5H-03, 14-5H-06, 14-5H-07, 14-5H-08, 14-5H-09, 14-5H-10, 14-5H-12, 14-5H-14, 14-5H-15, 14-5H-16, 14-5H-21 through 14-5H-23, 14-601,   14-602,   14-603,   14-605,   14-607,   15-101 through 15-103,   15-201,   15-202,   15-203,   15-204,   15-205,   15-206,   15-301,   15-302,   15-302.1,   15-303,   15-304,   15-305,   15-306,   15-307,   15-308,   15-309,   15-310 through 15-312,   15-313,   15-314,   15-315 through 15-316.1,   15-317,   15-401,   15-402,   15-402.1,   15-403,   15-501,   15-502,   8-205   )
Last Updated: 3/24/2022 8:38 AM
Click to return on the top page