Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; specifying that, to the extent practicable, the members appointed to the Task Force reflect the racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State; requiring the Task Force to examine the laws of intestacy in Maryland and make recommendations about how to revise the laws; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282814/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {282814/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page