Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Foley, Henson, Prettyman, and Ruth
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission to study and make recommendations to minimize risk and maximize safety for youth athletes; and requiring the Commission to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, the Maryland Department of Health and the General Assembly by December 31, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1346 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2022 10:25 AM
Click to return on the top page