Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study on REFUND - Re-Engineer Finances Under New Direction
Sponsored by
Delegate Novotny
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Department of State Police, and the Military Department to conduct a study on the feasibility of State agencies adopting certain budget practices; and requiring each department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding outcomes of the study by December 31, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Study on REFUND - Re-Engineer Finances Under New Direction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Study on REFUND - Re-Engineer Finances Under New Direction
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page