Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Baltimore City Behavioral Health Crisis Incident Review Team
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore City Behavioral Health Crisis Incident Review Team to examine behavioral health crises that involve interaction with law enforcement in Baltimore City and recommend and facilitate changes to minimize the need for law enforcement involvement in behavioral health crises; providing that meetings of the review team are closed to the public and not subject to the Open Meetings Act when discussing individual behavioral health crises or incidents; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-33)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Public Health - Baltimore City Behavioral Health Crisis Incident Review Team
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513027/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Baltimore City Behavioral Health Crisis Incident Review Team
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-33) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Baltimore City Behavioral Health Crisis Incident Review Team
(   24-1801 through 24-1807 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page