Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - COVID-19-Related Order Violations - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local health officer, within 24 hours after receiving an anonymous tip alleging that a business is in violation of a COVID-19-related order, to provide notice to the business; requiring the local health officer to provide the business with information regarding the anonymous tip that would help determine the nature and veracity of the anonymous tip; prohibiting the local health officer from providing the business with the name of the person who submitted the anonymous tip; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - COVID-19-Related Order Violations - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - COVID-19-Related Order Violations - Notice
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:25 PM
Click to return on the top page