Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2023, to appropriate at least $2,000,000 in the annual budget bill for a grant to Roca Baltimore, LLC; requiring the Juvenile Justice Reform Council to submit a supplemental report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1, 2021; and extending the termination date of the Council to June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {802017/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {233824/1 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388270/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {802017/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {233824/1 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {388270/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
(   4-1010 )
Last Updated: 5/5/2021 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page