Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the collector of property taxes of a county to sell certain property at a tax sale under certain circumstances; and requiring the collector of property taxes to sell certain property on receipt of a certain petition at the county's next regularly scheduled tax sale.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0657 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435166/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {189435/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {435166/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {189435/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Text - Chapter - Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Last Updated: 5/7/2021 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page