Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsored by
Delegate Thiam
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to review certain matters and make certain recommendations relating to the Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility; authorizing the Authority to acquire by certain means a Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility site or an interest in the site; requiring the Authority to transfer certain lease payments to the Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Fund under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0926
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page