Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Boteler, and McKay
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the local department of social services and the circuit court to provide notice to a child's foster parent, kinship parent, preadoptive parent, or caregiver of the right to intervene as a party in a proceeding concerning the child; extending to kinship parents certain rights granted to foster parents, preadoptive parents, and caregivers; granting to foster parents, kinship parents, preadoptive parents, and caregivers the right to intervene as a party in certain proceedings; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0893 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page