Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an Education Savings Account program in the State; stating the purpose of the program; establishing the requirements for participation in the program; requiring a certain deposit into the account of certain students; establishing a process for calculating and depositing a certain amount; limiting the use of certain funds to certain educational purposes; authorizing a parent to make a certain deposit in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   9.11-101 through 9.11-106 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page