Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Funding and Property Tax Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Charles, Henson, R. Jones, Landis, and Turner
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to reserve 2.5% of community development block grant funds awarded to the State for nonentitlement areas for award to affordable housing land trusts in the nonentitlement areas; establishing the intent of the General Assembly that certain entitlement areas award 2.5% of community development block grant funds to affordable housing land trusts; and exempting from property taxes real property held by an affordable housing land trust under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Funding and Property Tax Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Funding and Property Tax Exemption
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 4:01 PM
Click to return on the top page