Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Virtual School – Feasibility Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to conduct a feasibility study for developing, establishing, and operating a certain statewide virtual school; and requiring the Department to submit the findings of the feasibility study to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – Virtual School – Feasibility Study
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page