Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the appropriation of certain funds from the Opioid Restitution Fund to be made in accordance with certain settlement agreements; requiring the Secretary of Health to establish and administer a grant program for the distribution of certain opioid restitution funds to political subdivisions in accordance with a certain agreement; and requiring the Attorney General to identify and designate the controlling version of the settlement agreements.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0419
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text - Chapter - Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page