Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Edelson, and R. Lewis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1026
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a total of 10 new Class B-D-7 licenses and a total of 2 new Class A-7 licenses within a certain bounded area; providing that, in the 46th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City, a certain license may be issued and an existing license may be moved to a building that is within 300 feet of a place of worship or school under certain circumstances; prohibiting the Board from authorizing a license to a recipient of a certain State grant; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1100
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1026
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {193620/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1026
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Last Updated: 6/11/2024 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page