Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a limit on the hours the Department of Human Services may require an individual in the Family Investment Program to participate in work activities; establishing that an individual may participate in certain work experience or community service work activities and that the purpose of the work experience is to improve the employability of individuals who cannot find unsubsidized full-time employment; requiring the Department to include in its annual report information on work experience and community service activity placements; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0828
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-32)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793322/1
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Watson) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-37)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443229/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-32) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793322/1 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Watson) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-37) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Text - Chapter - Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page