Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on certain newly constructed or substantially rehabilitated dwellings; requiring that the property tax credit be equal to certain amounts in certain taxable years; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to provide for certain matters relating to the property tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page