Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service - County Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young and Henson
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to identify separately within the Department of Transportation's annual budget at least $4,305,908 of funding in fiscal year 2024 and a certain amount of funding in all subsequent fiscal years to be used for county elderly and handicapped transportation service; and requiring the Secretary to report annually by December 1 to certain committees of the General Assembly on the amount of funding distributed to each county and municipality pursuant to the Act for the prior fiscal year.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0838
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service - County Funding
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {333822/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service - County Funding
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Last Updated: 4/14/2022 10:15 AM
Click to return on the top page