Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $500,000 for the Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to take certain actions related to the inclusion of performance data and information in reports and the creation of a scorecard of quantifiable safety indicators; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0781
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {943721/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {293229/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713126/1 Adopted 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Floor Amendment {943721/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text - Chapter - Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard
(   9-3501, 9-3502 )
Last Updated: 5/24/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page