Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children - Substance Abuse Court-Ordered Evaluations and Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a circuit court for a county sitting as the juvenile court to order a child to enter a State-licensed substance abuse treatment program under certain circumstances; and requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to provide substance abuse treatment to a child who is ordered to enter a State-licensed substance abuse treatment program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Children - Substance Abuse Court-Ordered Evaluations and Treatment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Children - Substance Abuse Court-Ordered Evaluations and Treatment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2022 3/25/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   8-5A-01, 8-5A-02 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page