Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from increasing a tenant's rent solely because a judgment was entered against the tenant in a certain failure to pay rent action; requiring the District Court to seal court records within 60 days after the final resolution of a failure to pay rent proceeding if the proceeding does not result in a judgment of possession and no appeal is pending; authorizing certain sealed records to be opened under certain circumstances; authorizing a tenant to obtain a copy of a certain order in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {692915/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-42)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {692915/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-42) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page