Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Network Adequacy, Credentialing, and Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager or purchaser to maintain a reasonably adequate and accessible network of pharmacies; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager or purchaser from requiring a pharmacy or pharmacist to obtain or maintain certain accreditation, certification, or credentialing as a condition for participating in the pharmacy benefits manager's or purchaser's network; altering certain reimbursement requirements for pharmacy benefits managers and purchasers; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Network Adequacy, Credentialing, and Reimbursement
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page