Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor or the head of a certain unit to provide written notice to the Legislative Policy Committee within 72 hours after the earlier of the execution of the contract or the expenditure of funds when authorizing an emergency procurement during a state of emergency under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor or the head of a certain unit to provide a copy of a certain procurement contract to the Legislative Policy Committee; authorizing the Legislative Policy Committee to request a certain audit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0780
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334560/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text - First - States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {334560/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Returned Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 5/4/2021 9:03 AM
Click to return on the top page