Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, the percentage of the federal earned income tax credit used for determining the amount that an individual may claim as a refund under the Maryland earned income tax credit; repealing, for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, a certain limitation on the amount certain individuals may claim as a refund under the credit; allowing certain residents to continue to claim the credit for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page