Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Landis, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certification and regulatory scheme to certify dental assistants to perform certain intraoral procedures; specifying the intraoral procedures a dental assistant is authorized to perform without being certified by the State Board of Dental Examiners and the intraoral procedures that require certification; and authorizing the Board to penalize a licensed dentist who allows a dental assistant to provide dental care in an unauthorized manner or without required instruction or supervision.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {573328/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {613829/1 Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (121-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
(   4-101,   4-205,   4-301,   4-301.1, 4-302.1, 4-304.1, 4-305.1, 4-307.1, 4-309.1, 4-313.1, 4-315,   4-505   )
Last Updated: 5/23/2022 4:31 PM
Click to return on the top page