Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
Sponsored by
Delegate Novotny
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education and county boards of education to allow at least 10 minutes for testimony at public board meetings from parents and guardians of public school students; requiring each county board to establish and adopt a certain policy to promote parental involvement in the public school system; providing that certain parental rights are reserved to the parents and guardians of minor children; and prohibiting the State and certain other entities from infringing on those rights, except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
(   5-1501 through 5-1505 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page