Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker and Rose
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 30 to 52, the number of weekly drawings in a multi-drawing raffle that certain organizations in Carroll County may conduct; and repealing the $1,100 limitation on the value of the major prize in a multi-drawing raffle in Carroll County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-1)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-1) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Multi-Drawing Raffles
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page