Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Accountability - Parent Empowerment and Choice
Sponsored by
Delegates Kittleman, Arikan, McComas, and Otto
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing parents and legal guardians of students attending public schools that are not meeting State accountability goals to request county boards of education to implement certain intervention strategies, such as a restart model or a school closure model, by gathering signatures on a petition of more than 50% of the parents and legal guardians of students impacted by the failing school; requiring a county board, within 60 days of receipt of a petition, to make a certain determination, in writing, regarding the petition; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - School Accountability - Parent Empowerment and Choice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - School Accountability - Parent Empowerment and Choice
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Age
(   9.3-101 through 9.3-107 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page