Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Stein, Amprey, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Otto, Prettyman, Ruth, Stewart, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the land use needs to meet the full generation capacity authorized under the Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0999
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-29)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {773226/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (103-29) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-215 )
Last Updated: 3/24/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page