Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gasoline-Powered Leaf Blowers - Sale, Offering for Sale, and Use - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, and Ruth
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person that sells or offers for sale a gasoline-powered leaf blower in the State to notify the purchaser or potential purchaser that, beginning January 1, 2025, a person may not use a gasoline-powered leaf blower in the State; prohibiting the sale or offering for sale of gasoline-powered leaf blowers in the State beginning January 1, 2024; and prohibiting the use of gasoline-powered leaf blowers in the State beginning January 1, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Gasoline-Powered Leaf Blowers - Sale, Offering for Sale, and Use - Prohibition
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 5/4/2022 12:20 PM
Click to return on the top page