Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations (Maryland Child Care Working Families Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen (By Request - Study Group on Economic Stability) and Delegates Hill and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying certain eligibility requirements the State Department of Education shall use, and certain factors the Department shall consider, when determining a child's initial eligibility for the Child Care Scholarship Program; providing that a child who is determined eligible for the Program shall remain eligible for the following 12 months, regardless of certain changes in circumstances; establishing certain Program copayment requirements for certain families; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations (Maryland Child Care Working Families Act)
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 3/7/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page