Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurance policy of an obligor under a mechanical repair contract to provide certain coverage for contract nonperformance; and authorizing certain policies of insurance for mechanical repair contracts to be issued by certain certain risk retention groups.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0697
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Mechanical Repair Contracts – Insurance Reserves
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Mechanical Repair Contracts – Insurance Reserves
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-30)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-34)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Mechanical Repair Contracts – Insurance Reserves
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Mechanical Repair Contracts – Insurance Reserves
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (105-30) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923925/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (90-34) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page