Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women
Sponsored by
Delegate Arikan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member of the Workgroup from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing reimbursement for certain expenses; requiring the Workgroup to conduct a certain study and make certain recommendations; requiring the Workgroup to reporting its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page