Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to study certain matters relating to the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students and make recommendations regarding any statutory or regulatory changes to the Program; requiring, by December 31, 2021, the Department to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, and the General Assembly; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0522 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page