Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Maryland Cybersecurity Council Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Watson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Cybersecurity Council to conduct a certain study on cybersecurity coordination and operations in the State and develop a comprehensive cybersecurity coordination and response structure and plan for the State based on the findings from the study; and requiring the Council to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0069
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1618 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {546284/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {546284/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Maryland Cybersecurity Council Study and Report
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-104.1 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page