Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (The Cameron Carden Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates Henson, Ruth, Terrasa, Valderrama, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each public institution of higher education to adopt a certain policy that authorizes students to withdraw under extenuating circumstances of illness, injury, hospitalization, or mental health and wellness and that includes a provision to reimburse the student any tuition and fees paid by the student for the semester during which the student withdraws.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Student Withdrawal - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {963224/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (The Cameron Carden Act of 2022)
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-134 )
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page