Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Independent Adoption – Consent of Petitioner’s Spouse
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the spouse of a petitioner in an independent adoption proceeding join in the petition except under certain circumstances and substituting a requirement that the spouse consent in writing to the petition except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Independent Adoption – Consent of Petitioner’s Spouse
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Independent Adoption – Consent of Petitioner’s Spouse
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Conference Committee Report Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page