Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Maryland Wine and Grape Promotion Fund and the Advisory Commission on Maryland Wine and Grape Growing; establishing the Advisory Commission on Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing in the Department of Commerce as the successor to the Advisory Commission on Maryland Wine and Grape Growing; establishing the Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing Promotion Fund to provide grants that promote the advantages and attributes of State breweries, distilleries, and wineries and their products; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0698
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters Ways and Means
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Reassigned to Economic Matters Ways and Means 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {893226/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263127/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
(   5-1901 through 5-1912 )
Last Updated: 6/1/2022 9:39 AM
Click to return on the top page