Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, in fiscal years 2022 and 2023, the Board of Directors of the Maryland Corps Program to give priority to, when awarding Program funds, certain Program participants who serve with certain nonprofit corporations or government agencies that provide certain COVID-19 related services; and providing that if certain funding becomes available from the federal government it is the intent of the General Assembly that the funding be deposited in the Maryland Corps Program Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2021
Legislative Date
2/21/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
House 2/21/2021 2/21/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page