Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property - Recoupling With Federal Law (Maryland Manufacturing Tax Relief Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Hornberger, Kittleman, Queen, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing Maryland income tax modifications for certain deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property - Recoupling With Federal Law (Maryland Manufacturing Tax Relief Act of 2022)
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page