Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before June 1, 2021, the Maryland Department of Health, in collaboration with local health departments of the State and the Maryland State Department of Education, to adopt and implement a two-year plan to respond to the outbreak of COVID-19; requiring the plan to address the disproportionate impact of the pandemic on underserved and minority communities in the State; establishing the Maryland Public Health Modernization Workgroup to assess the current public health infrastructure and resources in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0741
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {346786/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-25)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {346786/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (113-25) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-1701, 11-1702 )
(   16-201.5, 18-9A-01 through 18-9A-04, 19-14C-01, 19-14C-02, 19-1814, 19-411 )
(   15-856 )
Last Updated: 4/23/2021 11:19 AM
Click to return on the top page