Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment – Zero–Emission Medium and Heavy Duty Vehicles – Regulations (Zero–Emission Truck Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations on or before December 1, 2022, establishing requirements for the sale of new zero-emission medium and heavy duty vehicles in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0687
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of the Environment – Zero–Emission Medium and Heavy Duty Vehicles – Regulations (Zero–Emission Truck Act of 2022)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-1103.1 )
Last Updated: 5/4/2022 12:24 PM
Click to return on the top page